|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6337.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5293.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5060.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee October 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read first time. To print. (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)
|
|
|