LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1549
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1549
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1549
Compare Versions
AB1549 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1549 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1549 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1549 Amended June 30, 2016
AB1549 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1549 Amended May 16, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 14, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1549 Introduced September 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1549 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1549 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1549 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1549 Amended June 30, 2016
AB1549 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1549 Amended May 16, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 14, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 13, 2016
AB1549 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1549 Introduced September 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare