California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 11, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill January 14, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016