California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1549 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/16/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1549AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 16, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 14, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wood SEPTEMBER 11, 2015 An act to add Section 14051 to the Government Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1549, as amended, Wood. Department of Transportation: state highway rights-of-way: fiber optic  cables: inventory.   cables.  Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of state highways and associated property. Existing law provides for the department to issue encroachment permits with respect to structures and activities in, under, or over any portion of the right-of-way of a state highway. This bill would require the department to maintain an inventory of all  broadband  conduits owned by the department that house fiber optic communication cables, that are located on state highway rights-of-way, and that  were   are  installed on or after January 1, 2017, and to make that information available upon request of verified companies or organizations working on broadband deployment.  The bill would require the department to notify verified companies and organizations of department-led highway construction projects and would authorize verified companies or organizations to collaborate with the department to install a broadband conduit as part of each project. The bill would require the department, as part of each project, to install broadband conduit capable of supporting fiber optic communication cables if no verified company or organization collaborates with the department and no broadband conduit previously exists in a project area   .  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14051 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14051.  (a)    The department shall maintain an inventory of all  broadband  conduits owned by the department that house fiber optic communication cables, that are located on state highway rights-of-way, and that  were   are  installed on or after January 1, 2017. The department shall make the information available upon request of verified companies or organizations working on broadband deployment.  (b) (1) During the design phase of a department-led highway construction project, the department shall notify verified companies and organizations of the project to encourage collaborative broadband installations.   (2) For the purpose of supporting fiber optic communication cables, after receiving notification from the department, a verified company or organization may collaborate with the department to install a broadband conduit as part of the project.   (3) If no verified company or organization collaborates with the department and no broadband conduit previously exists in the project area, the department, as part of the project, shall install a broadband conduit capable of supporting fiber optic communication cables.   (4) Nothing in paragraphs (1) to (3), inclusive, requires the department to report on cables owned by other entities.