|
09/14/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6565.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6570.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5375.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5314.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5203.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|