California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/14/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1550CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 369 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 14, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 31, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 11, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gomez JANUARY 4, 2016 An act to amend Section 39713 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1550, Gomez. Greenhouse gases: investment plan: disadvantaged communities. The California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006 designates the State Air Resources Board as the state agency charged with monitoring and regulating sources of emissions of greenhouse gases. The act authorizes the state board to include the use of market-based compliance mechanisms. Existing law requires all moneys, except for fines and penalties, collected by the state board as part of a market-based compliance mechanism to be deposited in the Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund and to be available upon appropriation. Existing law requires the Department of Finance, in consultation with the state board and any other relevant state agency, to develop, as specified, a 3-year investment plan for the moneys deposited in the fund. Existing law requires the investment plan to allocate a minimum of 25% of the available moneys in the fund to projects that provide benefits to disadvantaged communities, as defined, and a minimum of 10% to projects located in those disadvantaged communities. Existing law authorizes the allocation of 10% for projects located in disadvantaged communities to be used for projects included in the minimum allocation of 25% for projects that provide benefits to disadvantaged communities. This bill would instead require the investment plan to allocate (1) a minimum of 25% of the available moneys in the fund to projects located within, and benefiting individuals living in, disadvantaged communities, (2) an additional minimum of 5% to projects that benefit low-income households or to projects located within, and benefiting individuals living in, low-income communities located anywhere in the state, and (3) an additional minimum of 5% either to projects that benefit low-income households that are outside of, but within a 1/2 mile of, disadvantaged communities, or to projects located within the boundaries of, and benefiting individuals living in, low-income communities that are outside of, but within a 1/2 mile of, disadvantaged communities. The bill would become operative only if AB 1613 of the 2015-16 Regular Session is enacted and becomes effective on or before January 1, 2017. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 39713 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 39713. (a) The investment plan developed and submitted to the Legislature pursuant to Section 39716 shall allocate a minimum of 25 percent of the available moneys in the fund to projects located within the boundaries of, and benefiting individuals living in, communities described in Section 39711. (b) The investment plan shall allocate a minimum of 5 percent of the available moneys in the fund to projects that benefit low-income households or to projects located within the boundaries of, and benefiting individuals living in, low-income communities located anywhere in the state. (c) The investment plan shall allocate a minimum of 5 percent of the available moneys in the fund either to projects that benefit low-income households that are outside of, but within a 1/2 mile of, communities described in Section 39711, or to projects located within the boundaries of, and benefiting individuals living in, low-income communities that are outside of, but within a 1/2 mile of, communities described in Section 39711. (d) For purposes of this subdivision, the following definitions shall apply: (1) "Low-income households" are those with household incomes at or below 80 percent of the statewide median income or with household incomes at or below the threshold designated as low income by the Department of Housing and Community Development's list of state income limits adopted pursuant to Section 50093. (2) "Low-income communities" are census tracts with median household incomes at or below 80 percent of the statewide median income or with median household incomes at or below the threshold designated as low income by the Department of Housing and Community Development's list of state income limits adopted pursuant to Section 50093. (e) Moneys allocated pursuant to one subdivision of this section shall not count toward the minimum requirements of any other subdivision of this section. SEC. 2. This act shall become operative only if Assembly Bill 1613 of the 2015-16 Regular Session is enacted and becomes effective on or before January 1, 2017.