California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 23, 2016
Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016