|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 427, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2767.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2291.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1626.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|