California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015