LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB160
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB160
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB160
Compare Versions
AB160 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB160 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB160 Amended June 16, 2015
AB160 Amended May 5, 2015
AB160 Amended April 9, 2015
AB160 Amended March 19, 2015
AB160 Amended March 16, 2015
AB160 Introduced January 21, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB160 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB160 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB160 Amended June 16, 2015
AB160 Amended May 5, 2015
AB160 Amended April 9, 2015
AB160 Amended March 19, 2015
AB160 Amended March 16, 2015
AB160 Introduced January 21, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare