Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 5142.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|