LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1704
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1704
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1704
Compare Versions
AB1704 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1704 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1704 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1704 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1704 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1704 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1704 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1704 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1704 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1704 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare