California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1704 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016