Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 2. Page 5087.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|