LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1711
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Compare Versions
AB1711 Amended August 9, 2016
AB1711 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1711 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1711 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1711 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1711 Amended August 9, 2016
AB1711 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1711 Amended May 27, 2016
AB1711 Amended April 18, 2016
AB1711 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare