California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1711 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016