BILL NUMBER: AB 1711AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 9, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members McCarty and Medina (Coauthors: Assembly Members Baker, Cooper, Daly, Beth Gaines, Gipson, Low, and Olsen) (Coauthor: Senator Cannella) JANUARY 26, 2016 An act to add Section 68052.1 to the Education Code, relating to the University ofCalifornia.California, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1711, as amended, McCarty. University of California: nonresident student enrollment. Existing law expresses the intent of the Legislature that the University of California establish nonresident student tuition policies that are consistent with their resident student fee policies. The provisions are applicable to the University of California only if the Regents of the University of California act, by resolution, to make them applicable. This bill would require the University of California, in collaboration with the Academic Senate of the University of California, as a condition of receipt of funds appropriated in the annual Budget Act, toestablish a policy to require each campus to admit only nonresident undergraduate students who exceed the academic qualifications of resident undergraduate students, as specified,ensure that implementation of any admissions policy regarding admission of nonresident undergraduate students includes guidance that ensures the academic qualifications for admitted nonresident undergraduate students generally exceeds the academic qualifications of resident undergraduate students, and would require the University of California to report specified information to the Legislature annually regardingactions taken to ensure compliance withimplementation of the policy. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote:majority2/3 . Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 68052.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 68052.1. As a condition of receipt of funds appropriated in the annual Budget Act, and notwithstanding Section 68134, the University of California shall comply with both of the following: (a) By July 1, 2017, the University ofCalifornia shall establish a policyCalifornia, in collaboration with the Academic Senate of the University of California, shall ensure that implementation of any admissions policy it adopts regarding admission of nonresident undergraduate studentsto require that each campus of the University of California admit to that campus onlyshall include guidance that ensures that the academic qualifications for admitted nonresident undergraduate studentswho exceed thegenerally exceeds, on average, the academic qualifications of resident undergraduate students admittedto that campus and, in that regard, would stand in the upper one-half of the resident undergraduate students admittedatthat specificeach campus. (b) The University of California shall report to the Legislature annually regardingactions taken to ensure compliance withimplementation of this policy, including, but not limited to, the mean and median scores on academic indicatorsused in the admission process, the median scoreof admitted resident and nonresident undergraduate studentsfor each indicator at each campus, and the number of admitted nonresident undergraduate students who scored below the resident median on each indicatorat each campus. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure the University of California and the Academic Senate review policies regarding the academic qualifications of nonresident undergraduate students at the earliest possible time, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.