|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 6351.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5270.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4861.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|