California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016