LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1761
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1761
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1761
Compare Versions
AB1761 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1761 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1761 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1761 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1761 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1761 Introduced February 2, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1761 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1761 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1761 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1761 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1761 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1761 Introduced February 2, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare