Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 5013.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|