California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1771 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 19, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016