LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1771
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1771
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1771
Compare Versions
AB1771 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1771 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1771 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1771 Amended May 19, 2016
AB1771 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1771 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1771 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1771 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1771 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1771 Amended May 19, 2016
AB1771 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1771 Introduced February 3, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare