|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6206.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5161.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 5227.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5227.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 0. Page 5145.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|