LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1794
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1794
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1794
Compare Versions
AB1794 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1794 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1794 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1794 Amended June 9, 2016
AB1794 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1794 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1794 Introduced February 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1794 Chaptered September 21, 2016
AB1794 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1794 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1794 Amended June 9, 2016
AB1794 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1794 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1794 Introduced February 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare