California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1794 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016