|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 292, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6162.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5126.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4458.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|