LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1808
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1808
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1808
Compare Versions
AB1808 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1808 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1808 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1808 Amended June 2, 2016
AB1808 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1808 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1808 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1808 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1808 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1808 Amended June 2, 2016
AB1808 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1808 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare