California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1808 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016