|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6143.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5065.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 4723.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|