California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1887 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016