LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1887
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1887
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1887
Compare Versions
AB1887 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB1887 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1887 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1887 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1887 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1887 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1887 Amended March 10, 2016
AB1887 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1887 Chaptered September 27, 2016
AB1887 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1887 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1887 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1887 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1887 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1887 Amended March 10, 2016
AB1887 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare