|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6217.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5138.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|