LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1901
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1901
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1901
Compare Versions
AB1901 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1901 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1901 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1901 Amended March 14, 2016
AB1901 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1901 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1901 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1901 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1901 Amended March 14, 2016
AB1901 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare