California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1901 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill March 14, 2016