|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6484.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5420.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5240.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5122.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|