LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1922
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1922
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1922
Compare Versions
AB1922 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1922 Amended August 22, 2016
AB1922 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1922 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1922 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1922 Amended April 28, 2016
AB1922 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1922 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1922 Amended August 22, 2016
AB1922 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1922 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1922 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1922 Amended April 28, 2016
AB1922 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare