California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 22, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016