|
06/07/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4888.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3904.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4147.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|