California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1927 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2016

Amended

Bill May 17, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016