LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1927
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1927
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1927
Compare Versions
AB1927 Chaptered June 7, 2016
AB1927 Enrolled May 24, 2016
AB1927 Amended May 17, 2016
AB1927 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1927 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1927 Chaptered June 7, 2016
AB1927 Enrolled May 24, 2016
AB1927 Amended May 17, 2016
AB1927 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1927 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare