Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 5177.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5012.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|