LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1940
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1940
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1940
Compare Versions
AB1940 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1940 Amended May 3, 2016
AB1940 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1940 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1940 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1940 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1940 Amended May 3, 2016
AB1940 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1940 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1940 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare