California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Amended

Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016