|
09/12/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 296, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6147.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5060.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|