LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1977
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1977
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1977
Compare Versions
AB1977 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1977 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1977 Amended August 9, 2016
AB1977 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1977 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1977 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1977 Chaptered September 12, 2016
AB1977 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1977 Amended August 9, 2016
AB1977 Amended April 13, 2016
AB1977 Amended March 30, 2016
AB1977 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare