California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1977 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016