|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6111.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|