California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 13, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016