LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2001
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2001
Compare Versions
AB2001 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2001 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2001 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2001 Amended June 27, 2016
AB2001 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2001 Amended May 16, 2016
AB2001 Amended May 13, 2016
AB2001 Amended March 10, 2016
AB2001 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2001 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB2001 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2001 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2001 Amended June 27, 2016
AB2001 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2001 Amended May 16, 2016
AB2001 Amended May 13, 2016
AB2001 Amended March 10, 2016
AB2001 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare